Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Butte, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Butte County Department Of Child Support Services, against Pettigrew, Angela M, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2000 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions101 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Cycle Time1642 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER AFTER HEARING Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TAP | |
June 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: DCSS MTN FOR MOD: CHILD SUPPORT Desc2: FILED 3/09/05 Disp Code: 342 - HEARD/ORDERS MADE Disp Clerk: TAP Filing Clerk: ARE Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
April 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAIL OF NTC OF MTN ON STEVEN J SHERER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARE |
|
April 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAIL OF NTC OF MTN ON ANGELA M BATES Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARE |
|
March 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
RFO-OSC-MTN - Other (Non DCSS) NTC OF MTN BY DCSS FOR: MOD C/S, Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 36.30 Entry Clerk: ARE 40 - $14.00 260 - $9.00 280 - $3.30 297 - $10.00 |
|
May 30, 2001 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Issued ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED BUTTE (MMD) Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 1 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 7.00 Entry Clerk: BMK 40 - $7.00 |
|
April 10, 2001 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT CHILD SUPPORT (DEFAULT) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: RSM |
|
March 19, 2001 | Docket Event |
Judgment Default Entered for Parentage, Support & Reimburse JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT ENTERED FOR PATERNITY SUPPORT AND REIMBURSEMENT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MAB |
|
March 19, 2001 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application without Hearing APP & ORD FOR HICA Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MAB |
|
March 08, 2001 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL IN SUPPORT OF PARENTAGE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MAB |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.