Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Butte, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Butte County Department Of Child Support Services, against Cook, Stephan A, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2000 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions326 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Cycle Time5009 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NTC RE PYMNT OF SUP SUB OF PAYEE 08/25/2014 AS TO [D] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KLN | |
August 26, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NTC RE PYMNT OF SUP SUB OF PAYEE 08/25/14 AS TO [O/P] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KLN | |
August 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC RE PAYMENT OF SUPPORT SUBSTITUTION OF PAYEE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KKA |
|
January 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT CHILD SUPPORT (DEFAULT) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC |
|
January 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Judgment Default Entered for Parentage, Support & Reimburse 1ST SUPPLEMENTAL JUDGMENT REGARDING PARENTAL OBLIGATIONS FILED BY DCSS HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TLC |
|
January 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL OF C/S OFFICER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC |
|
January 13, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT & CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC | |
January 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration for Default - Uncontested DECL FOR DEFAULT OR UNCON JDGMT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC |
|
November 30, 2009 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE 1ST SUPP SUMM/COMPL ETC S COOK....DUP FILING Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC | |
November 30, 2009 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE SUMM/1 SUPP COMPL ETC S COOK Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.