Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Butte, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Butte County Department Of Child Support Services, against Lawson, William David, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2000 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions104 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Cycle Time2303 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Response - Other than Dissolution RESPONSE TO FL MATTER OTHER THAN DISSO FROM CL TRUST Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 569294 Fee Amount: 50.00 Entry Clerk: SDL 489 - $50.00 |
|
March 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Response - Other than Dissolution RESPONSE TO FL MATTER OTHER THAN DISSO FROM CL TRUST Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 569293 Fee Amount: 50.00 Entry Clerk: SDL 489 - $50.00 |
|
July 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: DCSS MTN FOR MOD OF C/S, W/A, C/CARE & Desc2: ARREARS **FILED 11/10/04** Disp Code: 342 - HEARD/ORDERS MADE Disp Clerk: TAP Filing Clerk: TAP Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
July 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: [D] MNT FOR PATERNITY TESTING Desc2: (DCSS RELATED) Disp Code: 342 - HEARD/ORDERS MADE Disp Clerk: TAP Filing Clerk: TAP Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
July 19, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER AFTER HEARING Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TAP | |
June 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration RESP DECL TO OSC/NTC OF MOTION Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARE |
|
June 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information GENETIC TEST RESULTS - DEFENDANT IS NOT EXCLUDED AS THE FATHER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARE |
|
June 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order - No Fee STIP FOR GENETIC (PARENTAGE) TESTING Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARE |
|
May 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
RFO-OSC-MTN - Initial (DCSS Only) (D) NTC MTN RE: PATERNITY TESTING (SET ASIDE?) Fee Type: W1 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 36.30 Entry Clerk: TAP 40 - $14.00 260 - $9.00 280 - $3.30 297 - $10.00 |
|
May 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: DCSS MTN FOR MOD C/S, W/A, C/CARE, ARRS Desc2: -FILED 11/10/04- Disp Code: 342 - HEARD IN PART-CONT FOR FURTH HRG 7-19-05 Disp Clerk: TAP Filing Clerk: DAB Judge: Gunn, David E |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.