Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Butte, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Butte County Department Of Child Support Services, against Beadles, Terri I, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 1998 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: DCSS MTN FOR MOD: C/S, DET/SET ARRS & Desc2: ORDER REPMT FILED 7/06/05 Disp Code: 342 - HEARD-ORDRS RE: CHILD SUPPORT MADE Disp Clerk: KKA Filing Clerk: ARE Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
August 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORDER AFTER 08/30/05 HEARING HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KKA |
|
July 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAIL OF NTC OF MTN ON TERRI BEADLES AND JAMES A WALLIS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARE |
|
July 06, 2005 | Docket Event |
RFO-OSC-MTN - Other (Non DCSS) NTC OF MTN BY DCSS FOR: MOD C/S, DET/SET ARRS & ORDER REPMT Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 36.30 Entry Clerk: ARE 40 - $14.00 260 - $9.00 280 - $3.30 297 - $10.00 |
|
July 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: DCSS MTN FOR MOD: C/S, DET/SET ARRS & Desc2: ORDER REPMT FILED 4/21/05 Disp Code: 948 - VACATED & RESET TO 6/28/05 Disp Clerk: SAS Filing Clerk: ARE Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
June 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Generic Hearing Desc: NTC OF RESCHEDULING Desc2: NTC OF MTN: MOD OF C/S, SET ARREARS Desc3: 07/05/05 @ 8:30 AM Notice Date: 2005-05-16 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 399 - NOTICES MAILED Disp Clerk: SAS Filing Clerk: SAS Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
June 28, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER AFTER HEARING Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TAP | |
June 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: DCSS MTN FOR MOD OF C/S, SET/DET ARREARS Desc2: & ORDER REPAYMENT**FILED 04/21/05* Disp Code: 342 - HEARD/ORDERS MADE Disp Clerk: TAP Filing Clerk: TAP Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
May 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: NTC OF RESCHEDULING NTC OF MTN: MOD OF C/S, SET ARREARS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAS |
|
May 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAIL OF NTC OF MTN ON TERRI I BEADLES AND JAMES A WALLIS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.