Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Butte, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Butte County Department Of Child Support Services, against Duncan, Kurt D, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 1998 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS MINUTES AND ORDER - FAMILY SUPPORT HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARE |
|
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF INCOME & EXPENSE, ADDITIONAL LETTERS AS TO O/P Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: NPA |
|
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: [DCSS] MTN MOD C/S Desc2: FILED 6/10/14 Desc3: *RECEIPT OF I&E'S* Disp Code: 399 - ORDERS MADE Disp Clerk: ARE Filing Clerk: ARE Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF INCOME AND EXPENSE ADDITIONAL CHILD SUPPORT AS TO DCSS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: NPA |
|
August 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL OF CHILD SUPPORT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: NPA |
|
August 06, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF DECL W/ AUDIT AS TO HEATHER BELSER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: NPA | |
August 06, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF DECL W/AUDIT AS TO [R] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: NPA | |
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION - [R] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: NPA | |
July 31, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF INCOME DECL AS TO [D] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: NPA | |
July 30, 2014 | Docket Event | INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION O/P Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.