Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Butte, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Butte County Department Of Child Support Services, against Purnell, Leonard C, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 01, 1998 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Desc: REVIEW HEARING Desc2: *MEDIATION REPORT* Notice Date: 2008-12-16 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 399 - COFFE Disp Clerk: CRW Filing Clerk: CRW Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
December 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: REVIEW HEARING AS TO PARTIES *MEDIATION REPORT* Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CRW |
|
December 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Desc: REVIEW HEARING Disp Code: 342 - HEARD/MEDN ORDERED/CONT: 2/3/09 @ 8:30 Disp Clerk: CRW Filing Clerk: TMS Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
June 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
RFO/OSC Motion Hearing Desc: [R] MTN FOR MOD OF C/S Desc2: CONT FROM THE TRIAL ON 01/11/08 Disp Code: 342 - HEARD IN PART-REVIEW SET FOR 12/16/08 Disp Clerk: TMS Filing Clerk: TMS Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
June 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS MINUTES AND ORDER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TMS |
|
April 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
RFO/OSC Motion Hearing Desc: [R] MTN FOR MOD OF C/S Desc2: CONT FROM 04/08/08 Disp Code: 342 - HEARD IN PART/CHILD SUPPORT ORDERS MADE Disp Clerk: TMS Filing Clerk: TMS Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
April 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS MINUTES AND ORDER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TMS |
|
April 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
RFO/OSC Motion Hearing Desc: [R] MTN FOR MOD OF C/S Desc2: CONT FROM TRIAL ON 01/11/08 FOR C/S Disp Code: 905 - CONTINUED TO 04/22/08 Disp Clerk: TMS Filing Clerk: TMS Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
April 01, 2008 | Docket Event | INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION [R] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB | |
February 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS MINUTES AND ORDER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.