Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Butte, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Butte County Department Of Child Support Services, against Youngblood, Patrick, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 1998 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL AS TO ESTELLE MULLINS COURT ORDER FILED 03/06/12 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KXC | |
March 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS MINUTES AND ORDER - FAMILY SUPPORT HRG: 03/06/12 HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
|
March 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: [DCSS] MTN: MOD C/S Desc2: FILED: 07/05/11 Desc3: *REVIEW IF BARRIERS TO EMPLOYMENT* Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CALENDAR Disp Clerk: DLB Filing Clerk: DLB Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
February 09, 2012 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF COURT ORDER FILED 2/7/12 & NTC OF CONTINUANCE AS TO DEFENDANT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW | |
February 09, 2012 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF COURT ORDER FILED 2/7/12 & NTC OF CONTINUANCE AS TO E MULLINS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW | |
February 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: [DCSS] MTN: MOD C/S Disp Code: 342 - HRD IN PART-CONT TO 3/6/12 @ 8:30 Disp Clerk: DLB Filing Clerk: DLB Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
February 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS MINUTES AND ORDER - FAMILY SUPPORT HRG: 02/07/12 HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
|
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS MAILED ON 1/26/12 TO [R] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
|
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR DCSS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
|
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS MAILED ON 1/26/12 TO [O/P] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.