Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Butte, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Butte County Department Of Child Support Services, against Rodriguez, Guillermo, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 15, 1997 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Generic Hearing Desc: TRAILING FAMILY LAW CASE FL022539 Desc2: DCSS MOTION: CONSOLIDATION Desc3: FILED 12/15/08 Disp Code: 399 - CONSOLIDATED INTO FL022539 Disp Clerk: CRW Filing Clerk: CRW Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
November 03, 1998 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Issued ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED BUTTE Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 7.00 Entry Clerk: BAD 40 - $7.00 |
|
August 03, 1998 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Issued ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 7.00 Entry Clerk: DAB 40 - $7.00 |
|
June 03, 1998 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filing Clerk: DAB Judgment Code: 252 - D.A. SUPPORT/REIMBURSEMENT Jud Dept: D10 Judge Name: HON. DAVID E GUNN, C Judgement Desc1: D.A. STIP JUDG - CHILD SUPPORT/REIMB Judgement Desc2: DEFT IS THE PARENT OF THE FOLLOWING MINOR CHILD(REN): SERGIO RODRIGUEZ BORN: 05/11/93 C/S RESERVED; ARREARS (5/1/95-12/31/97) $7872.00 AT $100.00 PER MONTH, COMMENCING ON 7/1/98. DEFT TO REIMBURSE THE COUNTY OF BUTTE FOR SUPPORT IN THE AMOUNT OF $ PAYABLE IN INSTALLMENT OF $________ PER MONTH, COMMENCING ON: / / |
|
June 03, 1998 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order STIP FOR JUDGMENT AND JUDGMENT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DAB |
|
March 17, 1998 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons Filed SUMMONS RETURNED & FILED JD 3/10/98 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DMS |
|
December 15, 1997 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE (170.6) JUDGE RUTHERFORD BY BUTTE COUNTY D.A. Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: YYY |
|
December 15, 1997 | Docket Event |
First Paper Filed - Fee COMPLAINT FILED; SUMMONS ISSUED Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 185.00 Entry Clerk: YYY 37 - $23.00 46 - $3.00 11 - $3.00 36 - $3.00 8 - $135.00 10 - $18.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.