Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Butte, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Butte County Department Of Child Support Services, against Edwards, Steven E, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 09, 1997 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF THE 03/01/11 MINUTES AND ORDER SERVED ON THE [R] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TMS | |
March 10, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF THE 03/01/11 MINUTES AND ORDER SERVED ON THE O/P Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TMS | |
March 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS MINUTES AND ORDER- FAMILY SUPPORT HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TLC |
|
March 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: DCSS MTN FOR MOD OF C/S Desc2: FILED 1/10/11 Disp Code: 340 - GRANTED; C/S & H/C ORDERED Disp Clerk: TLC Filing Clerk: SLG Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
January 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
RFO-OSC-MTN - Other (Non DCSS) MOTION FOR MOD OF C/S [DCSS] Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 40.00 Entry Clerk: SLG 495 - $40.00 |
|
January 10, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF MOTION AS TO ANITA MARIA KAMAITIS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SLG | |
January 10, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF MOTION AS TO STEVEN E EDWARDS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SLG | |
August 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAIL OF STIP/ORDER AS TO ANITA MARIA KAMAITIS 8/06/10 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
|
August 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAIL OF STIP/ORDER AS TO STEVEN E EDWARDS 8/06/10 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
|
August 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order STIP & ORDER FOR: CHILD SUPPORT FILED BY DCSS 70677(C) GC HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 20.00 Entry Clerk: TLC 494 - $20.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.