Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Butte, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Butte County Department Of Child Support Services, against Roseman, Christopher C, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 1996 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL AS TO RESPONDENT NTC RE: PMT OF SUPPORT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARE | |
April 22, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL AS TO OTHER PARENT NTC RE: PMT OF SUPPORT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARE | |
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC RE PAYMENT OF SUPPORT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: NPA |
|
March 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OF STIP SRVD ON [D] MLD 3/2/10 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: IRB |
|
March 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order STIP & ORDER ... HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 20.00 Entry Clerk: IRB 494 - $20.00 |
|
September 20, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER AFTER HEARING Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: LLM | |
September 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: DCSS MTN FOR MOD: C/S, CHILD CARE Desc2: FILED 7/13/05 Disp Code: 342 - HEARD-ORDER SIGNED Disp Clerk: LLM Filing Clerk: ARE Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
July 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAIL OF NTC OF MTN ON CHRISTOPHER C ROSEMAN AND STACY A CULLEN Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARE |
|
July 13, 2005 | Docket Event |
RFO-OSC-MTN - Other (Non DCSS) NTC OF MTN BY DCSS FOR: MOD C/S, C/C Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 36.30 Entry Clerk: ARE 40 - $14.00 260 - $9.00 280 - $3.30 297 - $10.00 |
|
February 24, 1998 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Issued ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED - BUTTE Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 7.00 Entry Clerk: DMS 40 - $7.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.