Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Puterson, Louis J, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Pro Per, against Klein, Jacob, Knight, Mellissa, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Leonard D. Goldkind presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeonard D. Goldkind Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2012 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Cycle Time467 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE FILE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 AND STANDING ORDER BCSC 2006-SO-05 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SLG | |
March 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: OSC RE: DISMISSAL (LR 4.6) Notice Date: 2013-02-28 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 331 - NO APPEARANCES;DISMISSED W/O PREJUDICE Disp Clerk: KAD Filing Clerk: LNN Judge: Goldkind, Leonard D |
|
February 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: OSC RE: DISMISSAL (LR 4.6) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: LNN |
|
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued and Filed COPY OF SUMMS ISSUED/ORIG RETAINED AND FILED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: RAD |
|
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Complaint - Unlawful Detainer (5 Day Summons Issued) COMPLAINT FILED-UNLAWFUL DETAINER - VERIFIED 5 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED Fee Type: CA Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 816516 Fee Amount: 240.00 Entry Clerk: RAD 539 - $240.00 |
|
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: RAD | |
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: NOTICE RE UNLAWFUL DETAINERS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: RAD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.