Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
G & S Investments, Inc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by ____Potter, Dirk, against Cloos, Edith Marcella, Knox, Donald, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Leonard D. Goldkind presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeonard D. Goldkind Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2006 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Cycle Time93 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: OSC RE: DISMISSAL (LR 4.6) Desc2: UNLAWFUL DETAINER Notice Date: 2007-02-22 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 331 - DISMISSED, REQUEST BY PLTFS ATTY Disp Clerk: WJA Filing Clerk: WJA Judge: Goldkind, Leonard D |
|
February 26, 2007 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: WJA | |
February 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: OSC RE: DISMISSAL (LR 4.6) UNLAWFUL DETAINER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: WJA |
|
December 20, 2006 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
December 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued and Filed COPY OF SUMMS ISSUED/ORIG RETAINED & FILED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: WJA |
|
December 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: NOTICE RE UNLAWFUL DETAINERS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: WJA |
|
December 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet COVER SHEET [CIVIL] Case Category Code: 32 Remedies: (M, N, P) # c/a: Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: WJA |
|
December 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Complaint - Unlawful Detainer (5 Day Summons Issued) COMPLAINT FILED-UNLAWFUL DETAINER - VERIFIED 5 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED CK#18024 Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 559393 Fee Amount: 195.00 Entry Clerk: WJA 445 - $195.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.