Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lansdale, Robert, Jr., filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Pro Per, against Morrison, Hubert E, Skyles, Caroline E, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with William O. Scott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam O. Scott Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2004 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Time To Trial28 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions30 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time1139 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE FILE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 AND STANDING ORDER BCSC 2006-SO-05 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAP | |
February 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Returned WRIT OF POSS RETURNED-PEACEFUL POSS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH |
|
February 02, 2005 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED CK#4656 Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 303741 Fee Amount: 7.00 Entry Clerk: MMH 292 - $7.00 | |
January 28, 2005 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT (CIVIL) ENTERED HON WILLIAM O SCOTT; COMMISSIONER (C11) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH | |
January 26, 2005 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR COMMISSIONER TO SIT AS JUDGE PRO TEM Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH | |
January 26, 2005 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Desc: COURT TRIAL - MUNI COURT/CIVIL Desc2: U.D. Notice Date: 2005-01-12 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 243 - JMT FOR PLTF Disp Clerk: MMH Filing Clerk: MMH Judge: Scott, William O |
|
January 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: COURT TRIAL - MUNI COURT/CIVIL U.D. Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH |
|
January 06, 2005 | Docket Event |
Memorandum MEMO TO SET FILED BY: PLTFF (X) COURT ( ) JURY - ... DAY(S) 1 HR(S) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH |
|
January 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
Answer - Response - Denial - Limited up to $10,000 ANSWER FILED BY H.MORRISON W/POS TO PLTFF (UNDER 10K) Fee Type: W1 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 152.00 Entry Clerk: MMH 11 - $2.00 279 - $47.00 37 - $29.00 36 - $8.00 46 - $3.00 280 - $8.00 284 - $25.00 324 - $20.00 329 - $10.00 |
|
January 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
Request to Waive Court Fees APP FOR ORDER WAIVING COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY DEFT:HUBERT MORRISON Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.