Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Miller, Brooke, Miller, Dennis, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Albrecht, Kelly, against Lavy, Sheri, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with William O. Scott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam O. Scott Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2004 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Time To Trial37 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions37 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time3845 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE FILE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 AND STANDING ORDER BCSC 2006-SO-05 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT | |
February 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Returned WRIT OF POSS RETURNED - UNSATISFIED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH |
|
January 26, 2005 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR COMMISSIONER TO SIT AS JUDGE PRO TEM HON. WILLIAM O. SCOTT; COMMISSIONER (D11) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH | |
January 26, 2005 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT (CIVIL) ENTERED HON. WILLIAM O. SCOTT; COMMISSIONER (D11) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH | |
January 26, 2005 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED CK#20341 Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 303203 Fee Amount: 7.00 Entry Clerk: MMH 292 - $7.00 | |
January 26, 2005 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Desc: COURT TRIAL - MUNI COURT/CIVIL Desc2: U.D. Notice Date: 2005-01-10 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 243 - JMT FOR PLTF Disp Clerk: MMH Filing Clerk: MMH Judge: Scott, William O |
|
January 18, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE SENT TO DEFNDT RETURNED WITH NEW ADDRESS, RESENT 1/20/05 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH | |
January 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: COURT TRIAL - MUNI COURT/CIVIL U.D. Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH |
|
January 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
Memorandum MEMO TO SET FILED BY: PLTFS ATTY (X) COURT ( ) JURY - ... DAY(S) .5 HR(S) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH |
|
December 27, 2004 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver ORDER RE: WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS GRANTED TO DEFT:SHERI LAVY Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.