Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Tiongson Solano Ramirez, Jocelyn, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Luis David Solano Ramirez, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management186 days |
Filing DateJuly 31, 2020 |
CategoryPetition |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
August 07, 2020 | Docket Event | JURISDICTION DATE: 08/02/20 | |
August 07, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND PETITION OF TIONGSON SOLANO RAMIREZ, JOCELYN SERVED ON LUIS DAVID SOLANO RAMIREZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/02/20 FILED | |
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY TIONGSON SOLANO RAMIREZ, JOCELYN (PETITION OR OTHER FIRST PAPER, INCLUDING A JOINT PETITION, FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE OR DOMESTIC PARTNERSHIP, LEGAL SEPARATION OR NULLITY) | |
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 32 | |
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event | RESTORE FORMER NAME: JOCELYN DACLES TIONGSON | |
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED | |
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED; 30 DAY - ORIGINAL RETAINED IN COURT FILE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.