Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Fernando Martinez, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Claudia Lorena Ortiz Palacios, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management183 days |
Filing DateJuly 27, 2020 |
CategoryPetition |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event | JURISDICTION DATE: 07/27/20 | |
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND PETITION OF MARTINEZ SERVED ON CLAUDIA LORENA ORTIZ PALACIOS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/27/20 FILED | |
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event | RESTORE FORMER NAME: N/A | |
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY FERNANDO MARTINEZ | |
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED; 30 DAY - ORIGINAL RETAINED IN COURT FILE | |
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT AND FAMILY LAW STATUS CONFERENCE | |
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 32 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.