Case Last Refreshed: 6 days ago
Patricia Joanne Jones, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Cameron Christie Selan, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts Superior with Judith D. Rhodes presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudith D. Rhodes Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 27, 2020 |
CategoryDv Req Orders |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2039 | Docket Event | *** CONSENT TO COMMISSIONER REDMOND SIGNED BY PETITIONER ONLY *** | |
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF DV-130 RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING SERVED ON CAMERON CHRISTIE SELAN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/20/20 FILED | |
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING (ORDER OF PROTECTION) - ORIGINAL FILED BY PATRICIA JOANNE JONES - RESTRAINING ORDER EXPIRES 09/16/25 | |
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | CONSENT FOR COURT ASSIGNMENT TO COMMISSIONER WILLIAM REDMOND FILED BY PATRICIA JOANNE JONES | |
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | HEARING ON REQUEST FOR DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RESTRAINING ORDER FILED BY PATRICIA JOANNE JONES FILED ON 07/27/20 | |
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF PETITION OF JONES SERVED ON CAMERON CHRISTIE SELAN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/28/20 FILED | |
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND PETITION OF JONES FILED | |
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF DV-110 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER SERVED ON CAMERON CHRISTIE SELAN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/07/20 FILED | |
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 34 (FAMILY LAW) | |
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT HEARING (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE) FILED BY PATRICIA JOANNE JONES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.