Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Victoria Hardy, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Travis Hardy, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management186 days |
Filing DateJuly 24, 2020 |
CategoryPetition |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event | JURISDICTION DATE: 07/28/20 | |
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND PETITION OF HARDY SERVED ON TRAVIS HARDY WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/28/20 FILED | |
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT AND FAMILY LAW STATUS CONFERENCE | |
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event | COMMUNITY AND QUASI-COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION FILED BY VICTORIA HARDY | |
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event | SEPARATE PROPERTY DECLARATION FILED BY VICTORIA HARDY | |
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY VICTORIA HARDY (PETITION OR OTHER FIRST PAPER, INCLUDING A JOINT PETITION, FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE OR DOMESTIC PARTNERSHIP, LEGAL SEPARATION OR NULLITY) | |
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED; 30 DAY - ORIGINAL RETAINED IN COURT FILE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.