Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
County Of Ventura, filed a(n) Complaint case against Oscar Frias, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryComplaint |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions64 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time72 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED (JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 03/04/20) | |
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT REGARDING PARENTAL OBLIGATIONS FILED | |
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED | |
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF COUNTY OF VENTURA AS TO OSCAR FRIAS | |
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR AMENDED PROPOSED JUDGMENT FILED | |
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | JURISDICTION DATE: 01/08/20 | |
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, AND PROPOSED JUDGMENT SERVED ON OSCAR FRIAS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/08/20 FILED | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 34 (FAMILY LAW) | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED; 30 DAY - ORIGINAL RETAINED IN COURT FILE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.