Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Kimberly Ann Sandlin, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Charles Evan Sandlin, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management182 days |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryPetition |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event | HEARING SECOND DAY OF TRIAL | |
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event | HEARING DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RESTRAINING ORDER FILED BY KIMBERLY SANDLIN 12/24/19 (T.E. 2 DAYS) | |
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDERS - CHILD SUPPORT, SPOUSAL SUPPORT, AND ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS FILED BY KIMBERLY ANN SANDLIN FILED ON 02/05/20 | |
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event | INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION OF CHARLES EVAN SANDLIN FILED | |
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event | RESP. EVID OBJECTION & REQUEST TO STRIKE REPLY DEC OF KIMBERLY SANDLIN 6/16/20 FILED BY CHARLES EVAN SANDLIN | |
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event | RESP. EVIDENTIARY OBJECTION & REQUEST TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF P&A 6/16/20 FILED BY CHARLES EVAN SANDLIN | |
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event | MODIFIED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.