Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cuauhtemoc Solorio, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Maria Estela Solorio, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management182 days |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryPetition |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event | JURISDICTION DATE: 12/31/19 | |
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND PETITION OF SOLORIO SERVED ON MARIA ESTELA SOLORIO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/31/19 FILED | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY CUAUHTEMOC SOLORIO (PETITION OR OTHER FIRST PAPER, INCLUDING A JOINT PETITION, FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE OR DOMESTIC PARTNERSHIP, LEGAL SEPARATION OR NULLITY) | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED; 30 DAY - ORIGINAL RETAINED IN COURT FILE | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 35 | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT AND FAMILY LAW STATUS CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.