Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Valerie Zavala, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Victor Alfonso Pina, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Judith D. Rhodes presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudith D. Rhodes Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryDv Req Orders |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time29 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING (CLETS) SERVED ON VICTOR ALFONSO PINA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/27/20 FILED | |
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event | HEARING ON REQUEST FOR DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RESTRAINING ORDER FILED BY VALERIE ZAVALA FILED ON 12/31/19 | |
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event | RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING (ORDER OF PROTECTION) - ORIGINAL FILED BY VALERIE ZAVALA - RESTRAINING ORDER EXPIRES 01/24/25 | |
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF DV REQ ORDERS OF ZAVALA SERVED ON VICTOR ALFONSO PINA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/09/20 FILED | |
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER FILED | |
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT HEARING (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE) FILED BY VALERIE ZAVALA | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | CONSENT FOR COURT ASSIGNMENT TO COMMISSIONER JUDITH D. RHODES FILED BY VALERIE ZAVALA | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: EX PARTE NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY VALERIE ZAVALA | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 34 (FAMILY LAW) | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDER (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE) FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.