Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Julio Cesar Mazariegos Castaneda, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Wendy Jackeline Lopez Pereira, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management183 days |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2019 |
CategoryPetition |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2043 | Docket Event | MEDIATOR: SAIDA GONZALEZ ON 2/5/20 | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
February 05, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDERS - CHILD CUSTODY & VISITATION FILED BY JULIO CESAR MAZARIEGOS CASTANEDA FILED ON 01/06/20 | |
February 05, 2020 | Docket Event | AGREEMENT AND ORDER RE: CUSTODY AND VISITATION FILED | |
February 05, 2020 | Docket Event | MEDIATION SET IN VENTURA | |
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDERS - CHILD CUSTODY & VISITATION FILED BY JULIO CESAR MAZARIEGOS CASTANEDA FILED ON 01/06/20 | |
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY WENDY JACKELINE LOPEZ PEREIRA | |
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event | RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY WENDY JACKELINE LOPEZ PEREIRA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.