Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
David Guadalupe Calderon, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Keneisha Bryana Sargent, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management183 days |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2019 |
CategoryPetition |
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2039 | Docket Event | ** DO NOT FILE IN THIS CASE - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED 02/20/20 ** | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED | |
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED AS TO DAVID GUADALUPE CALDERON | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY DAVID GUADALUPE CALDERON | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 32 | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT AND FAMILY LAW STATUS CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.