Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Michaela Boehm, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Deon De Wet, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management182 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 05, 2019 |
CategoryPetition |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions15 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time15 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD (CCP SECTION 285.1) FILED - FORMER ATTORNEY GUY C. PARVEX REMOVED AS TO MICHAELA BOEHM AND REPLACED BY PRO/PER | |
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF JMT OF DISSOLUTION; NTC OF ENTRY OF JMT ETC SERVED ON DEON DE WET FILED - DATE OF MAILING 11/26/19 | |
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event | MARITAL STATUS ENDING DATE: 05/08/20 | |
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTERED AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED | |
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OR LEGAL SEPARATION (FAMILY CODE 2336) FILED | |
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE, STIPULATION AND WAIVERS (RESPONDENT - DEON DE WET HAVING PREVIOUSLY MADE A GENERAL APPEARANCE) FILED BY MICHAELA BOEHM | |
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE & REQUEST FOR DISSOLUTION SERVED ON ATTORNEY/FIRM GUY C. PARVEX ON 11/06/19 FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.