Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Eugene Alfonso Sanchez, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Diana Escoto-Sanchez, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management183 days |
Filing DateNovember 04, 2019 |
CategoryPetition |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
February 05, 2020 | Docket Event | INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION OF DIANA ESCOTO-SANCHEZ FILED | |
February 05, 2020 | Docket Event | DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY DIANA ESCOTO-SANCHEZ | |
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF RESPONSE; UCCJEA DECLARATION SERVED ON EUGENE ALFONSO SANCHEZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/06/19 FILED | |
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event | RESPONSE FILED BY DIANA ESCOTO-SANCHEZ REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER | |
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY DIANA ESCOTO-SANCHEZ | |
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED AS TO DIANA ESCOTO-SANCHEZ | |
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event | JURISDICTION DATE: 11/05/19 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.