Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Shane Davis, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mary Jean Davis, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management180 days |
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2019 |
Category1St Amended Petition |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2020 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event | MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | |
March 30, 2020 | Docket Event | MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | |
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | FEE PAID BY MARY JEAN DAVIS (REQUEST OR STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING) REQUESTED/ORDERED ON 01/23/20 | |
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | |
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | FAX REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE AND ORDER FILED | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL KENNETH H.J. HENJUM FROM DATES OF 12/23/19 TO 01/06/20 FILED | |
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event | MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | |
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event | RESPONDENT'S MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BRIEF FILED BY MARY JEAN DAVIS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.