Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Karla Gutierrez, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Julian Alfredo Lopez Valeriano, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management180 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2019 |
CategoryPetition |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions42 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time544 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2020 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event | MARITAL STATUS ENDING DATE: 09/29/19 | |
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON PETITION OF GUTIERREZ AS TO JULIAN ALFREDO LOPEZ VALERIANO | |
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED BY KARLA GUTIERREZ | |
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTERED AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED | |
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OR LEGAL SEPARATION (FAMILY CODE 2336) FILED | |
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY KARLA GUTIERREZ | |
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED AS TO KARLA GUTIERREZ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.