Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Elizabeth A Stage, filed a(n) Petition case against John H Stage, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management180 days |
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2019 |
CategoryPetition |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions61 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time544 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2020 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTERED AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED | |
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OR LEGAL SEPARATION (FAMILY CODE 2336) FILED | |
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF SUMMONS AND PETITION SERVED ON JOHN H STAGE FILED - DATE OF MAILING 02/22/81 | |
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event | JURISDICTION DATE: 03/03/19 | |
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON PETITION OF STAGE AS TO JOHN H STAGE | |
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED | |
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND PETITION OF STAGE AS TO JOHN H STAGE FILED. SIGNED BY: JOHN H STAGE. DATE SIGNED: 03/03/19 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.