Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Araceli Heredia Garduno, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mario Abarca Procopio, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management180 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2019 |
CategoryPetition |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions235 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time235 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2020 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTERED AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED | |
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event | MARITAL STATUS ENDING DATE: 10/14/19 | |
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OR LEGAL SEPARATION (FAMILY CODE 2336) FILED | |
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED BY ARACELI HEREDIA GARDUNO, MARIO ABARCA PROCOPIO | |
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY ARACELI HEREDIA GARDUNO | |
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY MARIO ABARCA PROCOPIO | |
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE, STIPULATION AND WAIVERS (RESPONDENT - MARIO ABARCA PROCOPIO HAVING PREVIOUSLY MADE A GENERAL APPEARANCE) FILED BY ARACELI HEREDIA GARDUNO, MARIO ABARCA PROCOPIO | |
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.