Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Celia Graciela Cruz, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Raul Contreras, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management180 days |
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2019 |
CategoryPetition |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2020 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND PETITION OF CRUZ SERVED ON RAUL CONTRERAS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/04/19 FILED | |
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | JURISDICTION DATE: 03/04/19 | |
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION UNDER UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) FILED | |
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 33 | |
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED | |
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED; 30 DAY - ORIGINAL RETAINED IN COURT FILE | |
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT AND FAMILY LAW STATUS CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.