Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Brenda Elizabeth Ortiz, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ernestor Ortiz, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management180 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2019 |
CategoryPetition |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions49 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2039 | Docket Event | ** DO NOT FILE IN THIS CASE - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED 07/31/19 ** | |
August 25, 2020 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION PRIOR TO STATUS ENDING DATE - WITH PREJUDICE FILED | |
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTERED AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED | |
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OR LEGAL SEPARATION (FAMILY CODE 2336) FILED | |
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON PETITION OF ORTIZ AS TO ERNESTOR ORTIZ | |
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY ERNESTOR ORTIZ | |
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY BRENDA ELIZABETH ORTIZ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.