Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
County Of Ventura, filed a(n) Complaint case against Mario Pech Castellon, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 31, 2013 |
CategoryComplaint |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions266 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time2426 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event | MEDIATION SET IN VENTURA | |
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDERS (POST JUDGMENT) RE: MODIFICATION - CHILD CUSTODY VISITATION FILED BY MARIO PECH CASTELLON FILED ON 02/11/20 | |
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event | AGREEMENT AND ORDER RE: CUSTODY AND VISITATION FILED | |
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER AFTER HEARING ON REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF FEES FILED BY RUTH GONZALEZ - GRANTED | |
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event | HEARING ON DENIED FEE WAIVER AS TO RUTH GONZALEZ | |
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event | HEARING REGARDING SCHEDULING OF MEDIATION | |
March 27, 2020 | Docket Event | HEARING ON DENIED FEE WAIVER AS TO RUTH GONZALEZ | |
March 23, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDERS (POST JUDGMENT) RE: MODIFICATION - CHILD CUSTODY VISITATION FILED BY MARIO PECH CASTELLON FILED ON 02/11/20 | |
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event | MEDIATION SET IN VENTURA | |
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR HEARING ABOUT COURT WAIVER ORDER FILED BY RUTH GONZALEZ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.