Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Alma Arredondo, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Jose Alejandro Alvarado, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management186 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 31, 2013 |
CategoryPetition |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions68 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time186 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2014 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
January 07, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTERED AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED | |
January 07, 2014 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OR LEGAL SEPARATION (FAMILY CODE 2336) FILED | |
January 07, 2014 | Docket Event | MARITAL STATUS ENDING DATE: 05/08/14 | |
January 03, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON PETITION OF ARREDONDO AS TO JOSE ALEJANDRO ALVARADO | |
January 03, 2014 | Docket Event | DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY ALMA ARREDONDO | |
January 03, 2014 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED BY ALMA ARREDONDO | |
November 15, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND PETITION OF ARREDONDO SERVED ON JOSE ALEJANDRO ALVARADO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/07/13 FILED | |
November 15, 2013 | Docket Event | JURISDICTION DATE: 11/07/13 | |
October 31, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT AND FAMILY LAW STATUS CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.