Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Eric Kuehl, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Aura Kuehl, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with JoAnn Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoAnn Johnson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management186 days |
Filing DateOctober 31, 2013 |
CategoryPetition |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions489 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time777 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event | FEE PAID BY AURA KUEHL (STIP AND ORDER NOT REQUIRING A HEARING; REQUEST OR STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CMC NOT REQUIRING A HEARING - FAMILY LAW) | |
April 28, 2015 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
April 27, 2015 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SUBMISSION OF JUDGMENT | |
March 04, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTERED AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED | |
March 04, 2015 | Docket Event | MARITAL STATUS ENDING DATE: 02/25/15 | |
March 04, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OR LEGAL SEPARATION (FAMILY CODE 2336) FILED | |
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event | MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | |
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event | FAX REQUEST FOR OFF-CALENDAR AND ORDER FILED | |
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE, STIPULATION AND WAIVERS (RESPONSE ALREADY FILED) FILED BY ERIC KUEHL, AURA KUEHL | |
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED BY ERIC KUEHL, AURA KUEHL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.