Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Joseph Lopez, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Chylo Lopez, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with JoAnn Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoAnn Johnson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management193 days |
Filing DateOctober 31, 2013 |
CategoryPetition |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions9557 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time425 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2039 | Docket Event | *** ***** CASE DISMISSED 12/30/14 ***** *** | |
May 19, 2015 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED | |
November 18, 2014 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
May 12, 2014 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
October 31, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT AND FAMILY LAW STATUS CONFERENCE | |
October 31, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED AS TO JOSEPH LOPEZ | |
October 31, 2013 | Docket Event | WIFE'S FORMER NAME: N/A | |
October 31, 2013 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED | |
October 31, 2013 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY JOSEPH LOPEZ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.