Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jonathan R Barker, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Lisa M Barker, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with JoAnn Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoAnn Johnson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management185 days |
Filing DateMarch 29, 2013 |
CategoryPetition |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions451 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2039 | Docket Event | MEDIATOR: PAISLEY PIJUAN ON 1/4/16 | |
December 31, 2039 | Docket Event | MEDIATOR: PAISLEY PIJUAN ON 4/22/13 | |
December 31, 2039 | Docket Event | MEDIATOR: PAISLEY PIJUAN ON 3/27/14 | |
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF STIPULATION AND ORDER SERVED PER SERVICE LIST FILED - DATE OF MAILING: 05/20/19 | |
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER - CHILD SUPPORT FILED | |
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDERS (POST JUDGMENT) RE: MODIFICATION - CHILD SUPPORT & PAYMENT PLAN ON ARREARS FILED BY LISA M BARKER FILED ON 04/03/19 | |
April 19, 2019 | Docket Event | RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO REQUEST FOR ORDERS SET FOR 05/09/19 FILED BY JONATHAN R BARKER | |
April 19, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF RFO AND BLANK VISITATION VERIFICATION SERVED PER SERVICE LIST FILED - DATE OF MAILING: 04/19/19 | |
April 19, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO REQUEST FOR ORDER SERVED ON COUNTY OF VENTURA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/19/19 FILED | |
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event | AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR ORDER; INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION (NON-COMPLAINT) SERVED ON JONATHAN R BARKER BY DEPUTY A. PORTILLO ON 04/09/19 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.