Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sarah Burnett, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Matthew Burnett, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with JoAnn Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoAnn Johnson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management186 days |
Filing DateMarch 28, 2013 |
CategoryPetition |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions347 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time600 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION QDRO RE CO OF LOS ANGELES DEFERRED COMPENSATION AND THRIFT PLAN (HORIZONS) FILED | |
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD (CCP SECTION 285.1) FILED. FORMER ATTORNEY EVIE P JEANG REMOVED AS TO MATTHEW BURNETT AND REPLACED AS PRO/PER | |
November 03, 2014 | Docket Event | AMENDED INCOME WITHHOLDING FOR SUPPORT FILED BY SARAH BURNETT | |
August 21, 2014 | Docket Event | STIP DRO RE LA COUNTY EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT ASSOCIATION (LACERA) FILED BY DARREN J GOODMAN | |
August 18, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF STIP OF ALL PARTIES RE DIVISION OF PAID TIME OFF OMITTED FROM JMT, SUPP; ETC FILED BY SARAH BURNETT | |
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER OF ALL PARTIES RE DIVISION OF PAID TIME OFF OMITTED FROM JMT, SUPPORT OFFSET, ATTY FEES FILED | |
August 11, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDERS (POST JUDGMENT) - DIVISION OF OMITTED ASSET, QDRO FILED BY SARAH BURNETT FILED ON 07/03/14 | |
August 07, 2014 | Docket Event | FEE PAID BY SARAH BURNETT (STIP AND ORDER NOT REQUIRING A HEARING; REQUEST OR STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE OFHEARING OR CMC NOT REQUIRING A HEARING - FAMILY LAW) | |
July 29, 2014 | Docket Event | RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO OSC/NOTICE OF MOTION SET FOR 08/11/14 FILED BY MATTHEW BURNETT | |
July 23, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND RESPONSE OF EMPLOYEE PENSION BENEFIT PLAN COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES COMPENSATION AND THRI FILED BY JOHN F KRATTLI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.