Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Robert Eric Staback, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Kim Marie Staback, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with JoAnn Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoAnn Johnson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management185 days |
Filing DateMarch 29, 2013 |
CategoryPetition |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions201 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time201 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2014 | Docket Event | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER FILED | |
May 30, 2014 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION AND ORDER RESTORING FORMER NAME OF KIM MARIE RUST FILED | |
April 22, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATED QDRO RE TRANSAMERICA RETIREMENT SOLUTIONS FILED | |
January 17, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND RESPONSE OF EBP SERVED ON ROBERT ERIC STABACK FILED. DATE OF MAILING 01/03/14 | |
January 17, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND RESPONSE OF EMPLOYEE PENSION BENEFIT PLAN CALIFORNIA PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYST EM FILED BY PRO/PER | |
January 13, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND TELEPHONE NUMBER FILED BY ROBERT ERIC STABACK | |
October 16, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OR LEGAL SEPARATION (FAMILY CODE 2336) FILED | |
October 16, 2013 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTERED AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED | |
October 16, 2013 | Docket Event | MARITAL STATUS ENDING DATE: 10/08/13 | |
September 30, 2013 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.