Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
State Of Ct Et Al, filed a(n) Complaint case against Tracy Ortiz, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryComplaint |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time3328 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 34 DUE TO JUDICIAL REASSIGNMENT | |
January 30, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 36 DUE TO JUDICIAL REASSIGNMENT | |
March 12, 2007 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED | |
January 11, 2006 | Docket Event | JURISDICTION DATE: 01/19/06 | |
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 34 | |
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES # 61069 | |
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED; 30 DAY | |
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.