Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Christopher Limon, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Arlene Limon, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryPetition |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions12419 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2039 | Docket Event | ** CASE DISMISSED 08/13/08 ** | |
December 31, 2039 | Docket Event | MEDIATOR: ART CARDIEL ON 04/04/06 | |
August 13, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED | |
July 23, 2008 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER AT OSC FILED | |
July 23, 2008 | Docket Event | TERMINATION OF ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR CHILD SUPPORT FILED BY ARLENE LIMON | |
July 17, 2008 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY ARLENE LIMON (STIP AND ORDER NOT REQUIRING A HEARING; REQUEST OR STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CMC NOT REQUIRING A HEARING - FAMILY LAW) | |
May 15, 2008 | Docket Event | APPLICATION AND ORDER TO PROCEED IN PRO PER FILED BY ARLENE LIMON | |
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED REMOVING ATTORNEY ANGELA D. CURTIS AS TO CHRISTOPHER LIMON. PARTY IS NOW ACTING IN PRO/PER. | |
November 08, 2006 | Docket Event | MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (FAMILY LAW) | |
September 07, 2006 | Docket Event | COUNTER REQUEST FOR FAMILY LAW TRIAL SETTING FILED BY CHRISTOPHER LIMON. TIME ESTIMATE: 1/2 DAY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.