Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Anthony R. Anico, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Irma A. Abdul-Razak, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryPetition |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions83 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time122 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2006 | Docket Event | (FL) CASE REVIEW CONFERENCE | |
March 23, 2006 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTERED AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED | |
March 23, 2006 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OR LEGAL SEPARATION (FAMILY CODE 2336) FILED | |
March 23, 2006 | Docket Event | MARITAL STATUS ENDING DATE: 08/03/06 | |
March 15, 2006 | Docket Event | DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY AND FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY ANTHONY R. ANICO | |
March 15, 2006 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON PETITION OF ANICO AS TO IRMA A. ABDUL-RAZAK. | |
March 06, 2006 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND PETITION OF ANICO SERVED ON IRMA A. ABDUL-RAZAK WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/02/06 | |
March 06, 2006 | Docket Event | JURISDICTION DATE: 02/02/06 | |
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: COURT ASSIGNMENT (FAMILY LAW) FILED | |
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED; 30 DAY - ORIGINAL RETAINED IN COURT FILE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.