Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Kaiserslautern Germany, filed a(n) Statement case against Clarence Lofton, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryStatement |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 34 DUE TO JUDICIAL REASSIGNMENT | |
March 14, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 36 DUE TO JUDICIAL REASSIGNMENT | |
April 14, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE REGARDING PAYMENT OF SUPPORT SERVED ON CLARENCE LOFTON FILED. DATE OF MAILING 04/14/11 | |
April 14, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE REGARDING PAYMENT OF SUPPORT (LOCAL CHILD SUPPORT AGENCY NO LONGER PROVIDING SERVICES) FILED | |
April 14, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE REGARDING PAYMENT OF SUPPORT SERVED ON RENATE TRUDERUNG-LOFTON FILED. DATE OF MAILING 04/14/11 | |
February 27, 2009 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ORDER AFTER HRG,NTC OF RIGHTS & RSPNSBLTS SERVED ON CLARENCE LOFTON FILED. DATE OF MAILING 02/27/09 | |
February 27, 2009 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ORDER AFTER HRG,NTC OF RIGHTS & RSPSBLTS SERVED ON RENATE TRUDERUNG-LOFTON FILED. DATE OF MAILING 02/27/09 | |
February 19, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED | |
February 17, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CHILD SUPPORT, INTEREST PAYMENT ON ARREARS FILED 1-12-09. BY CLARENCE LOFTON | |
January 27, 2009 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO OSC SERVED ON RENATE TRUDERUNG-LOFTON FILED. DATE OF MAILING 01/27/09 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.