Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Vega, Silvia, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Cardona, Vicente, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Tafoya, Robert S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTafoya, Robert S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2008 |
CategoryDomestic Violence With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time1644 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2012 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents CASE FILE |
|
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents CASE FILE |
|
October 27, 2008 | Hearing |
Substitution of Attorneys OLD ATTORNEY: PHONG H HAN NEW ATTORNEY: PRO PER |
|
October 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorneys OLD ATTORNEY: PHONG H HAN NEW ATTORNEY: PRO PER |
|
September 16, 2008 | Hearing |
FLDV Documents Forwarded to Law Enforcement for DELANO PD |
|
September 16, 2008 | Hearing |
Restraining Order After Hearing - CLETS RESTRAINING ORDERS EXPIRE: 8/1/2011 JUDGE: R S TAFOYA |
|
September 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing - CLETS RESTRAINING ORDERS EXPIRE: 8/1/2011 JUDGE: R S TAFOYA |
|
September 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
FLDV Documents Forwarded to Law Enforcement for DELANO PD |
|
August 01, 2008 | Hearing |
NP1105 Department: BD Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: SILVIA VEGA (PE-1) APPEARS WITH PHONG H HAN ESQ. JORGE BALFOUR PRESENT AND DULY SWORN AS SPANISH INTERPRETER FOR SILVIA VEGA (PE-1). PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. VICENTE CARDONA (RE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. RESPONDENT DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. RESTRAINING ORDERS AND STAY-AWAY ORDERS GRANTED AS PRAYED. MEDIATION AGREEMENT ON FILE HEREIN MADE AN ORDER OF THE COURT. ATTORNEY PHONG H. HAN ESQ. TO PREPARE ORDER AFTER HEARING. |
|
August 01, 2008 | Hearing |
4113 OSC Domestic Violence New Calendar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.