Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Palisades Collection, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Gaba, Rudolfo, against Flores, Edna C, Flores, Ralph, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2013 |
Category09-Cl >10K <25K Other Collections-Civil Limited |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2013 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents CASE FILE |
|
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents CASE FILE |
|
January 24, 2012 | Hearing |
Writ Returned Wholly Satisfied FROM KERN COUNTY |
|
January 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ Returned Wholly Satisfied FROM KERN COUNTY |
|
November 30, 2010 | Hearing | Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction | |
July 31, 2009 | Hearing |
4184 Order to Show Cause (CRC 3.740(f)) New Calendar |
|
July 31, 2009 | Docket Event |
4184 Order to Show Cause (CRC 3.740(f)) New Calendar |
|
June 04, 2009 | Hearing |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for PALISADES COLLECTION, LLC (PL-1). Received from PLAINTIFF, check no(s) 42549. Receipt #460224 for amount of $15.00. |
|
June 04, 2009 | Hearing |
Writ of Execution Issued KERN COUNTY |
|
June 04, 2009 | Hearing | Memorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.