Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Guanzon, Veronica, filed a(n) (32) Limited Residential Ud - Under 10,000 (Cvud) case represented by Potter, Dirk, against Begley, Brian, Price, Angel, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2018 |
Category(32) Limited Residential Ud - Under 10,000 (Cvud) |
Time To Trial62 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time62 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Satisfied | |
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession | |
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
UD Settlement Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event | UD Judgment for Plaintiff | |
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of UD Settlement Conference /Trial | |
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Request/Counter-Request to Set Case for Trial - UD | |
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.