Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Catona, Rodica, Catona, Petru, filed a(n) (32) Limited Residential Ud - Under 10,000 (Cvud) case against Petit, Brenda, Goodwin, Billy, Goodwin, Terri, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 13, 2017 |
Category(32) Limited Residential Ud - Under 10,000 (Cvud) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time35 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Satisfied | |
August 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 17, 2017 | Docket Event | UD Judgment for Plaintiff | |
August 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession | |
August 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
August 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of UD Settlement Conference /Trial | |
August 04, 2017 | Docket Event | At-Issue Memorandum | |
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
July 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Order | |
July 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.