Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Noble, Brett C, filed a(n) (32) Limited Residential Ud - Under 10,000 (Cvud) case against Ahmad, Justin, Ahmad, Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 08, 2016 |
Category(32) Limited Residential Ud - Under 10,000 (Cvud) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1334 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time1334 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Dismissed by Court | |
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Calendar
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
April 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Reschedule - COVID 19 | |
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice | |
December 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Tickler | |
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Unlawful Detainer Address |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.