Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, filed a(n) (32) Limited Residential Ud - Under 10,000 (Cvud) case represented by Aldridge Pite Llp, against St Louis, James, St Louis, Sherry, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2012 |
Category(32) Limited Residential Ud - Under 10,000 (Cvud) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions76 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time76 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2013 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
March 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
March 04, 2013 | Docket Event | UD Judgment for Plaintiff | |
March 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
March 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
February 14, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice | |
February 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
February 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
February 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.