Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lopshire, Colleen, filed a(n) (32) Limited Residential Ud - Under 10,000 (Cvud) case represented by Potter, Dirk, against Burr, Frank, Burr, Kenneth F, represented by Party Defaulted, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 10, 2012 |
Category(32) Limited Residential Ud - Under 10,000 (Cvud) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions31 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time31 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Satisfied | |
January 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession | |
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Trial - Short Cause
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event | UD Judgment for Plaintiff | |
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Judgment by Court | |
January 02, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice | |
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.